Derwin Butler, Sr. v. Escamilla et al
Plaintiff: Derwin Butler, Sr.
Defendant: Escamilla and H. Luna
Case Number: 1:2017cv00623
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies and ORDER Directing Clerk to Terminate Motions and Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/25/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/12/2017. Show Cause Response due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING Miscellaneous Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Terminating Miscellaneous Filing 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/22/17. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derwin Butler, Sr. v. Escamilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derwin Butler, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escamilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?