Palomar v. Sessions, III et al
Petitioner: Arturo Valenzuela Palomar
Respondent: Jeffrey B Sessions, III, John F Kelly and Craig Meyer
Case Number: 1:2017cv00638
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Respondents' 16 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/28/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting in Part Respondents' 11 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER Denying in Part Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/14/2018. Sixty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and ORDER DENYING Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/2/2018. Attorney Ruben Salazar terminated. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palomar v. Sessions, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo Valenzuela Palomar
Represented By: Ruben Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey B Sessions, III
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John F Kelly
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig Meyer
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?