Melvin R. Brummett, Jr. v. J. Rivero
Plaintiff: Melvin Ray Brummett, Jr.
Defendant: J. Rivero
Case Number: 1:2017cv00639
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal 40 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to File Dispositional Documents within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 32 , 36 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/8/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00639-LJO-SAB(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to File Document Numbers 38 and 39 in Case Number 1:16-cv-01400-AWI-SAB (PC), in Case Number 1:17-cv-00639-SAB (PC) and Shall be DISREGARDED in Case Number 1:16-cv-01400-AWI-SAB (PC) as Filed in Error re 20 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2018. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Amend the Complaint as unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Defendant to File a Response to the Complaint Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISCHARGING WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Melvin Ray Brummett, Jr., CDCR #V-29100, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/18/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Inmate Melvin Ray Brummett, Jr., CDCR# V-29100 on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. at California State Prison, Corcoran, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference on September 18, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2017. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM at CSP-Corcoran before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, FINDING THIS ACTION SHALL PROCEED ON PLAINTIFF'S RETALIATION CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT DEAN, SEVERING RETALIATION CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT RIVERO, AND DISMISSING ALL OTHER CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melvin R. Brummett, Jr. v. J. Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Ray Brummett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?