Cliff v. Matevousian
Petitioner: Antrone Cliff
Respondent: Andre Matevousian
Case Number: 1:2017cv00641
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Respondent's 23 Motion to Dismiss; Ten Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/8/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 9/25/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting 13 Findings and Recommendations; denying 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and referring back to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/9/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Motion of Summary Judgment be DENIED re 8 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ;referred to Judge Drozd; new case number is 1:17-c-00641-DAD-JLT (HC),signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/19/2017. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 2 Motion to Expedite signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cliff v. Matevousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antrone Cliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andre Matevousian
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Timothy Howard Delgado(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?