Joseph Sanzberro v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Sanzberro
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00644
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Action with Prejudice,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/22/2018. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 JOINT Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Finalization of Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/10/18.Joint Report Deadline: 10/22/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER as follows: Pursuant to this Court's Order of August 20, 2018, and subject to the Parties' Confidentiality Agreement of April 6, 2018, Defendant, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ("Ocwen"), is hereby ORDERED to produce documents reflecting Ocwen's net worth by September 4, 2018. The Court finds that documents reflecting Ocwen's Financial Statements as of December 31, 2017, are sufficient. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/4/2018. (Rooney, M)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order rejecting 46 stipulated protective order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/4/2018. The parties are granted leave to submit a compliant stipulated protective order for Court approval. (Rosales, O)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Stay and Denying 22 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/29/2017. (These related cases are referred to the assigned magistrate judge for Initial Scheduling Conference which is currently set for 2/14/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER setting this matter for an Initial Scheduling Conference for 2/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean pursuant to the relating/reassignment of this matter to case nos. 1:17-CV-00643-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV -00645-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV-00649-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV-00655-DAD-EPG, 2:17-CV-00967-DAD-EPG, 2:17-CV-00972-DAD-EPG, and 2:17-CV-00979-DAD-EPG. The Court further ORDERS any pending scheduling conference VACATED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/4/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Briefing Dates Relating to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/24/17. (Hellings, J)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of TERMINATE Defendant Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Sanzberro v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sanzberro
Represented By: Joshua Branden Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?