Bettencourt v. McCabe, et al.
Plaintiff: Gary Ray Bettencourt
Defendant: Brian McCabe, John Kirihara, Steve L. Griffin and Vanise Bettencourt
Case Number: 1:2017cv00646
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Finding Appeal Frivolous and Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/10/2018. (Flores, E)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing 12 Action without Leave to Amend and Dismissing State Law Claims without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/20/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 10/16/2017.(Flores, E)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/28/2017. (Flores, E)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/24/2017. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Re-Designate This Action as a Regular Civil Rights Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/17. (Hellings, J)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:17-cv-0888 DB PC) to Fresno (1:17-cv-0646 SAB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/8/2017; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bettencourt v. McCabe, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ray Bettencourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kirihara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve L. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanise Bettencourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?