McMillen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Fred D. McMillen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00664
Filed: May 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (EAJA) AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/2018. (Kusamura, W)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/7/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER for an extension of time of 7 days for Defendant's response to Plaintiff's opening brief. Defendant has until June 8, 2018, to submit a response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. All other dates in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 7) shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/1/2018. (Timken, A)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER for a Third Extension of Time of 14 Days for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. Defendant has until June 1, 2018, to submit a response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. All other dates in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 6) shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/21/2018. (Timken, A)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER for a Second Extension of Time for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. 20 . Defendant has until May 18, 2018, to submit a response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. All other dates in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 6) shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/2018. (Timken, A)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time of 35 days for Plaintiff's Opening Brief. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's opening brief by no later than May 4, 2018. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Docs. 7, 16) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/28/2018. (Timken, A)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF. Plaintiff shall file her Opening Brief on or before February 26, 2018. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 7) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/17/2017. (Timken, A)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred D. McMillen
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?