April 10, 2019 |
Filing
77
ORDER DISCHARGING 72 Order to Show Cause; DISIMISSING the Action with Prejudice; and DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to CLOSE this Matter signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/9/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 2, 2019 |
Filing
72
ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. The Court HEREBY ORDERS the parties TO SHOW CAUSE within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this order why dispositive documents have not yet been filed. The parties are forewarned that the failure to show cause may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/02/2019. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 12, 2019 |
Filing
71
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/12/19. Dispositional Docs Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
|
February 14, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs motion for final approval of class action settlement is GRANTED; Plaintiffs motion for class counsels attorney fees and expenses is GRANTED IN PART AND D ENIED IN PART; The Court approves the settlement amount of $10,000.00 and the parties and settlement administrator are directed to implement this Final Order and the settlement agreement in accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement; Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance, Inc. is approved as the cy pres beneficiary to receive any undistributed settlement funds in this action; The Court approves an incentive award of $1,500.00 to the class representative; The Court approves attorney fees and expenses of $27,965.10 to class counsel; and The parties are further directed to file a stipulated final judgment by March 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/13/2019. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing
67
ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 13,2019 HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/2019. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 4, 2019 |
Filing
65
ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file supplemental briefing on or before February 7, 2019, addressing the issues identified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2019. (Hernandez, M)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing
61
ORDER GRANTING ECF 58 JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND VACATING NOVEMBER 28, 2018 HEARING. The court also set a Final Approval Hearing: February 13, 2019 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/05/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 28, 2018 |
Filing
57
ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending dates and matters in this action are VACATED; and The parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement on or before October 26, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE ANY OBJECTION TO PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE WITHIN FIVE DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/18/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and VACATING September 7, 2018 Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. Proposed Class Action Notice and Class List due within twenty (20) days. Second Phase Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
|
August 9, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Oversize Brief, 48 . Plaintiff is hereby granted leave to submit a motion for class certification, exceeding no more than thirty-five (35) pages. Defendant may similarly file an opposition brief not to exceed thirty-five pages. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/9/2018. (Timken, A)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing
47
ORDER re Joint Request for Briefing Schedule. ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule: (1.) Plaintiff's motion for class certification shall be filed on or before August 10, 2018; (2.) Defendant's opposition shall be filed on or before August 24, 2018; (3.) Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before August 31, 2018; and (4.) The motion for class certification shall be heard on September 7, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2018. (Herman, H)
|
July 11, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER FOLLOWING INFORMAL TELECONFERENCE AND CONTINUING DEADLINE TO FILE NOTICE RE CLASS SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before July 26, 2018, the parties shall file a notice either 1) informing the Court if the settlement will proceed an d addressing how the concerns raised in the order denying the motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement have been resolved or 2) requesting that a briefing schedule be set for a motion for class certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
July 2, 2018 |
Filing
41
ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE NOTICE RE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Accordingly, the deadline to file notice regarding whether the parties will be pursuing settlement or the matter should proceed to a scheduling conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to July 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/2/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
June 13, 2018 |
Filing
40
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that notice of whether the parties intend to pursue settlement or need a scheduling conference set shall be filed on or before July 3, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/13/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing
38
ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND VACATING JUNE 13, 2018 HEARING 32 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties joint motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement is DENIED without prej udice; The parties shall notify the Court in writing within fourteen (14) days from the date of service of this order they will continue to pursue settlement or if a scheduling conference need be set; and the hearing set for June 13, 2018 is VACATED and the parties need not appear at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/5/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 22, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Directing Clerk of Court to Administratively Terminate Motion to Certify Class re 19 , 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/18. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 7, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to file supplemental briefs regarding class certification currently scheduled for March 7, 2018 is CONTINUED to March 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE on or before March 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/14/2018. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting in Part Defendant's Request to Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/18. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER REQUIRING Ari H. Marcus to SHOW CAUSE Why Pro Hac Vice Application should not be Denied; Show Cause Response due within Five (5) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The deadline to complete class certification discovery is amended to December 15, 2017; and all other aspects of the July 28, 2017 scheduling order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 22, 2017 |
Filing
12
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
10
SCHEDULING ORDER - Class Certification Deadline: Motion Filing 1/12/2018; Discovery Deadline: 12/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)
|