King v. Villegas et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee King
Defendant: R. Villegas, P. Cruz and J. Curry
Case Number: 1:2017cv00676
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendants' 106 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be Denied and Plaintiff's 108 Motion for Leave to Amend be Granted In Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/17/2022. Objections to F&R due within TWENTY-ONE DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER allowing parties to submit supplemental briefs within 21-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/10/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING 101 Findings and Recommendations, and DENYING 99 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/29/2021. (Rivera, O)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 99 Motion for Injunctive Relief be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/23/2021. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen Days. (Sant Agata, S)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to File Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/23/2020.( Case Management Deadline: 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Re: Lodged Amended Complaint; Plaintiff to File a Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/20/2019. THIRTY-DAY DEADLINE. (Orozco, A)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 82 Motion to Stay; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 59 Motion for an Order to Produce Documents for Inspection/Motion to Compel and 86 Motion to Amend without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/24/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING as MOOT Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/7/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order to Senior Assistant Attorney General Monica Anderson, the Warden of Mule Creek State Prison, and the Litigation Coordinator at Mule Creek State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/07/2019. (Flores, E)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/6/2019. (Jessen, A)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Requesting that the Warden of California Correctional Institution Respond to Plaintiff's Motion; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy and Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Senior Assistant Attorney General Monica Anderson, the Warden of California Correctional Institution, and the Litigation Coordinator at California Correctional Institution signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/29/2019. (Flores, E)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Following Discovery and Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/25/2019. (Flores, E)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why he Should not be Sanctioned for Failure to Appear; ORDER for Warden of Mule Creek State Prison to SHOW CAUSE Why he or she Should not be Sanctioned for Failure to Comply with a Court Order; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order to Senior Assistant Attorney General Monica Anderson, the Warden of Mule Creek State Prison, and the Litigation Coordinator at Mule Creek State Prison; Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2019.(Sant Agata, S)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Adopting 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/12/2019. (Flores, E)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE and ORDER That Inmate Witness Is No Longer Needed as Witness In These Proceedings, and that the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged re 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/17/19. (Gonzalez, R)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re: Plaintiff's Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jerry Lee King on January 17, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/14/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/26/18. Objections, If Any, Due Within Twenty-One Days. Referred to Judge Ishii. (Gonzalez, R)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/18/2018 setting Settlement Conference for 1/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Lundstrom, T)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/11/2018. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/11/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Adopting 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and Return Service Documents, and Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of His Complaint 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/1/18. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that all Claims, and Defendants be Dismissed, Except for Plaintiff's Claims for Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment Against Defendants R. Villegas and P.Cruz re 1 , 10 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/8/18. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Finding Cognizable Claims; ORDER for Plaintiff to: (1) Notify the Court that he is willing to proceed only on the claims of excessive force in violation of the eighth amendment against Defendants Villegas and Cruz (2) File a First Amended Compl aint; or (3) Notify the Court that the wishes to stand on his complaint, subject to this Court issuing Findings and Recommendations to a District Judge Consistent with this order,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/08/17. ( Amended Complaint due : 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/30/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Villegas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?