Amerisure Mutual Insurance Co., et al. v. Illinois Union Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Paramount Petroleum Corporation and Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00678
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/23/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
August 22, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 E-Service Notice Proof of E-Service re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice)(Cho, Ryong)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/20/2017. (Disposition documents due by 8/25/2017)(Kusamura, W)
July 19, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT as to all Parties and Request for Continuance of all Case Deadlines and Hearing Date for Mandatory Scheduling Coference by Paramount Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 E-Service Notice)(Cho, Ryong)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER #6 to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. Responsive pleading due by 7/21/2017. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2017 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard)
June 7, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE Plaintiff Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company's Certificate of Interested Parties by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Cho, Ryong Alexander added. (Attachments: #1 Notice Plaintiff Paramount Petroleum Corporation's Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Proof of Service Notice of Proof of Service of Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint Served on Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cho, Ryong)
June 2, 2017 Filing 4 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO EASTERN DISTRICT LOCAL RULE 144(a) by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard)
May 17, 2017 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Civil New Case Documents for LJO, Proof of Service re Civil New Case Documents; Initial Scheduling Conference by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard)
May 17, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 LJO Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Hellings, J)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court for the State of California, County of Kern, case number BCV-17-100861 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7066412) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons)(Endres, Richard) (Refunded $400.00 duplicate Filing Fee, receipt number 0972-7066231) Modified on 5/17/2017 (Butolph, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerisure Mutual Insurance Co., et al. v. Illinois Union Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Represented By: Ryong Alexander Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Represented By: Ryong Alexander Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard S. Endres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?