Ruiz v. Mobert
Plaintiff: Rogelio May Ruiz
Defendant: R. Mobert
Case Number: 1:2017cv00709
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/24/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 44 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING 45 Motion to Supplement Pleadings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/20/2020. (Marrujo, C)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCREENING ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be Permitted to Proceed on his Excessive Force Claim Against Defendant Mobert and that all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed; Referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/28/2020. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Regarding Limited Purpose Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/4/18. ( Amended Complaint due 120 Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER on Recruitment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/27/2018: The court will attempt to recruit counsel for plaintiff Rogelio May Ruiz. The Alternative Dispute Resolution and Pro Bono Program Director is directed to recruit counsel from the Pro Bono Panel. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/21/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 30 Objections to Court's Denial of Equal Protection Rights to Spanish Interpreter, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/29/17. (Gonzalez, R)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SECOND ORDER DENYING Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, as Unnecessary 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/17. (Hellings, J)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause 21 , 26 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for the failure to obey a Court Order and Failure to prosecute,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/2017. Show Cause Response 21-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, as Unnecessary 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/4/17. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Mobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio May Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?