Briscoe, III v. County of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: James Robert Briscoe, III
Defendant: County of Fresno, Fresno County District Attorney, David Gottlieb, Erin Ormonde, Arresting Agent, The Financial Insurer Company for Bail Sharks Bailbonds Agency and Fresno Police Department
Case Number: 1:2017cv00716
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/21/2018 that Plaintiff's 37 Third Amended Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 10/25/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint and Request for Legal Assistance. (Docs. 28 and 30) Plaintiff's "Request for a 80-Day Extension to File Third Amended Complaint" (Doc. 28) and "Request for a Reasonable Extension to File His Third Amended Complaint or Granted Ancillary Services" (Doc. 30) are DENIED. Plaintiff shall file his third amended complaint no later than August 20, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/1/2018. (Timken, A)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's fourth request to extend time to file amended complaint, and directing appearance by supervising deputy attorney general. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/18/2018. (Timken, A)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, 24 . Plaintiff is granted ninety (90) days from May 8, 2018, in which to file his amended complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/17/2018. (Timken, A)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting In Part Plaintiff's Second 20 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint and Directing Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff Copy of Screening Order 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/16/18. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, 16 . Plaintiff is granted sixty days from the date of service of this order in which to file his amended complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2018. (Timken, A)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING Second Amended Complaint Without Prejudice and With Leave to Amend. Within thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint that follows the analysis of this order; an d if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in compliance with this order, the undersigned will recommend to the assigned district judge that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/26/2018. (Timken, A)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO BE ALTERED OR AMENDED (Doc. 10) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/9/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's Request for First Amended Complaint to be Altered or Amended to substitute Richard Madrid for Defendant John Doe 1 through 100 is GRANTED; and2. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, after which the Court will proceed to screen the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(a) (requiring the Court to screen complaints brought by prisoners seeking relief against a governmental entity or officer or employee of a governmental entity).(Thorp, J)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Re-Designate Action from 550 (Conditions of Confinement) to 440 (Regular Civil) and Vacating First Information Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/30/2017. (Flores, E)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/10/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briscoe, III v. County of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert Briscoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Ormonde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arresting Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Financial Insurer Company for Bail Sharks Bailbonds Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?