Edward B. Spencer v. Kelso et al
Plaintiff: Edward B. Spencer
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso and Bruce Barnett
Case Number: 1:2017cv00724
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand be Granted and that all other Pending Motions be Denied as Moot; Objections, if any, to be Filed within 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/14/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 1/2/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TERMINATING Defendant J. Clark Kelso; ORDER TERMINATING 5 25 30 Motions as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/29/2017. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Request 6 for Suspension of Requirement to File Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/12/2017. (30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward B. Spencer v. Kelso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Barnett
Represented By: R. Lawrence Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?