Jason Allan Singer v. Matthew Braman et al
Plaintiff: Jason Allan Singer
Defendant: Matthew Braman, Sandy Cartwright, Stephany Munoz and Downtowner Inn
Case Number: 1:2017cv00725
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CASE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS (ECF Nos. 1, 11). Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections due within 14 days. Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/27/2017. (Thorp, J)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file an amended complaint, document 17 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/11/2017. (Rooney, M)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING 14 Findings and Recommendations Entered on July 31, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/7/17. Amended Complaint due by 10/6/2017. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim, failure to prosecute, and failure to comply with the Court's June 15, 2017 Order. These findings and recommendations will be s ubmitted to the United States District Judge assigned to this case pursuant to the provisions of Title 28 of the United States Code section 636(b)(1). Within fourteen (14) days after being served with these findings and recommendations, the parties m ay file written objections with the Court. The document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations." The parties areadvised that failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to appeal the District Court's order. Bastidas v. Chappell, 791 F.3d 1155, 1159 (9th Cir. 2015). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/31/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING, with leave to amend, Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to consider the standards set forth in this Order and should only file an amended complaint if he believes his claims are cognizable. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than July 17, 2017. Failure to file an amended complaint by the date specified will result in dismissal of this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/15/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Redesignate Case From a Prisoner Civil Rights Case to a Non-Prisoner Civil Rights Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/26/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Allan Singer v. Matthew Braman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Allan Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Braman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephany Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtowner Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?