Naba v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angelina Naba
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00726
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close this Action in Light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/5/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2018. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 EXTENSION OF TIME, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2018. Opening brief due by 2/15/2018. (Hall, S)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP 2 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER DIRECTING Service of the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/17. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naba v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Naba
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?