Beavers v. New Penn Financial, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Beavers
Defendant: New Penn Financial, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, LP, Resurgent Mortgage Servicing and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00747
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting Settlement Conference for 5/10/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/2/2018. (Rooney, M)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/29/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 6/15/2018; Non-Expert 11/19/2018; Expert 12/17/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfi eld, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/28/2019; Hearing by 2/25/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/8/2019; Hearing by 4/12/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/ 2019 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hall, S)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS 1, 3, 4 and 5 of the Second Amended Complaint and All Defendants Except New Penn Financial LLC, dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation with Prejudice re 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/12/2018. (Hall, S)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 35 Defendants' Motion to Strike, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2018. (Hall, S)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order continuing the Scheduling Conference to January 29, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2017. ( Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/14/2017 has been CONTINUED to 1/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston ) (Rosales, O)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 24 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/12/2017. Second Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2017. Responsive pleading due by 9/6/2017. (Hall, S)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to Amend Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/1/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/29/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Remand the Matter; ORDER VACATING the Hearing Date on the Motion to Remand; ORDER DISMISSING the Complaint with Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/2017. Motion hearing set for 7/26/2017 at 09:00 AM is VACATED. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavers v. New Penn Financial, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial, LLC
Represented By: Preston Ascherin
Represented By: Parisa Jassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Represented By: Preston Ascherin
Represented By: Parisa Jassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Preston Ascherin
Represented By: Parisa Jassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Preston Ascherin
Represented By: Parisa Jassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?