April 3, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER Dismissing Case Subject to Terms of Consent Decree and Final Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/02/2019. (Flores, E)
|
February 8, 2019 |
Filing
53
CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/7/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
|
January 10, 2019 |
Filing
51
ORDER re: 50 Notice Tentative Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2019. Stipulation for issuance of a consent decree SHALL be filed by 1/31/2019. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE. By 4:00 p.m. on January 10, 2019, all motions in limine, with supporting points and authorities, shall be filed and served either personally or by facsimile upon opposing counsel. The Pretrial Order's schedule and instructions for oppositions, replies, and the hearing for the motions in limine remain unchanged and in effect. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/3/2019. (Timken, A)
|
January 2, 2019 |
Filing
46
ORDER DENYING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 43 . Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/2/2019. (Timken, A)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
42
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2019, at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/18/2018. (Timken, A)
|
December 10, 2018 |
Filing
39
ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 27 . Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED as to the following claims: a) The unlawful rent collection claims (eleventh claim for relie f) of Mario Tolls, Arissa Dickson Tolls, and Tanya Lewis; b) The Bane Act claims (fourth claim for relief) of Arissa Dickson Tolls, Tanya Lewis, and Tanisha Wiley. Defendants shall FILE by January 10, 2019, a memorandum of fees and costs with supp orting affidavits concerning Defendants' fees and costs expended in relation to the unlawful rent collection claims pleaded by Mario Tolls, Arissa Dickson Tolls, and Tanya Lewis. Plaintiffs may FILE by January 24, 2019, an opposition to Defendants' memorandum of fees and costs. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is otherwise DENIED. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/10/2018. (Timken, A)
|
October 5, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER on JOINT APAPLICATION and STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs' opposition and related documents shall be filed on October 9, 2018. Defendants' reply shall be filed on October 16, 2018. The hearing will take place as previously noticed on October 22, 2018. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/5/2018. (Timken, A)
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER 25 for Extension of Expert Discovery and Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/17/2018. Expert Discovery completed by 9/1/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/10/2018; Hearing by 10/8/2018. (Hall, S)
|
May 2, 2018 |
Filing
24
ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Non-expert 6/29/2018; Expert 7/20/2018. (Hall, S)
|
February 1, 2018 |
Filing
20
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2018. Stipulated Protective Order is GRANTED; to file documents under seal, the parties SHALL request sealing pursuant to Local Rule 141. (Hall, S)
|
October 2, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER GRANTING the 14 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Mark Roy and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to Update the Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2017. Attorney Mark Roy terminated as counsel for plaintiffs. (Hall, S)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
11
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/11/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 12/10/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 9/18/2017; Non-Expert 5/4/2018; Expert 7/13/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set fo r 2/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/27/2018; Hearing by 8/24/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/10/2018; Hearing by 10/22/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
|