Millsap v. People of the State of Calfornia
Petitioner: Fernando Singleton Millsap
Respondent: People of the State of Calfornia
Case Number: 1:2017cv00793
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 4/2/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Respondent's request to withdraw motion to dismiss 18 , 22 and setting briefing schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 15 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/6/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/16/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millsap v. People of the State of Calfornia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Singleton Millsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of Calfornia
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?