Sharon Gonzales v. Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Gonzales
Defendant: Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Estee Lauder, Inc. and M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00806
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Closing the Action signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/18/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER AFTER 43 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2019. Stipulated dismissal due by 11/15/2019. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER 39 to Amend Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/9/2019. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/16/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 2/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER 37 to Continue Settlement Conference, Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/11/2018. Settlement Conference continued to 6/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Stree t before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference continued to 6/24/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial continued to 8/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2018. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 10/25/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/14/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 10/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on 7 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint and Cross Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/7/2017. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharon Gonzales v. Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gonzales
Represented By: Curtis Eugene Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Wm. Davenport
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Lenkov
Represented By: Robert P. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Estee Lauder, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Wm. Davenport
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Lenkov
Represented By: Robert P. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?