Jorgenson v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Paul Jorgenson
Defendant: Thomas Moore, M.D., United States of America, Richard B. Haak, M.D., Jaspal Randhawa and Emanuel Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2017cv00817
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ADOPTING 120 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSING Case and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge and Close Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/2020. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 117 Defendants Emanuel Medical Center and Jaspal Randhawa's Motion to Dismiss/Request for the Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction be GRANTED re 19 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADOPTING 116 Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/04/2020. (Flores, E)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendants be Granted Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Battery Claims re 29 , 46 ; Referred to Judge UnassignedDJ, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/10/2020. Objections to F&R, if any, due within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ADOPTING 101 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING 75 Defendant United States' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and ORDER Dismissing Defendant United States From This Action signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/27/2020. (Jessen, A)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant United States be Dismissed from this Action with Prejudice because of Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim and because of Plaintiff's Failure to Follow this Court's Local Rules signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/9/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that the Four Unknown Correctional Officers be Dismissed from this Action, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M) 90 ; Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/20/2019. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) Days.(Orozco, A)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING 93 Findings and Recommendations re 46 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/2/2019. (Jessen, A)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING 93 Findings and Recommendations signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/30/2019. (Flores, E)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ADOPTING 91 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/1/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant Haak's Partial Motion to Dismiss 46 be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/23/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants EMS and Randhawa's Motions to Dismiss be Granted in Part and Denied in Part re 29 , 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/12/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Following Status Conference; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Judgment on the Pleadings re [75-1], signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/10/19. (Gonzalez, R)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Inmate Assistance at Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/23/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint and DENYING 76 Motion for Leave to Seek Punitive Damages Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2019. Third Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 73 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/10/2019. (Hellings, J)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/26/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel Without Prejudice 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/28/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting United States' 48 Ex Parte Request for an Extension of Time to Provide Initial Disclosures; ORDER Extending Deadline for Filing Scheduling Conference Statements, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/22/19. (Gonzalez, R)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 19 & 20 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/31/2018: This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That This Action Proceed on Plaintiff's FTCA Claim Against the United States, His Eighth Amendment Bivens Claim Against the Four Unknown Correctional Officers, and His State Tort Claims for Medical Negl igence and Battery Against Defendants Haak, Randhawa, and Emanuel Medical Center, and That All Other Claims and Defendants Be Dismissed With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING 16 Findings and Recommendations, and Allowing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/21/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that this Action Proceed on Plaintiff's FTCA Claim Against the United States and His State Tort Claims for Medical Negligence and Battery Against Defendants Haak, Randhawa, and Emanuel Medical Center, and that all Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, re 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/16/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorgenson v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Moore, M.D.
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Haak, M.D.
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaspal Randhawa
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel Medical Center
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?