De La Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cruz Falcon De La Cruz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00820
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Nancy Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security, and Against Plaintiff Cruz Falcon DeLaCruz, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/21/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/22/2018. Plaintiff shall file his Opening Brief no later than February 26, 2018. All other dates in this Court's scheduling order issued on June 30, 2017 (Doc. 6 ) are modified accordingly. (Valdez, E)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/29/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz Falcon De La Cruz
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?