Lutrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mark A Lutrell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00821
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to close case re 17 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/2/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 4/6/2018 for plaintiff to file an opening brief, with all other dates extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/12/2018. (Rooney, M)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER granting an extension of time for Plaintiff to file an Opening Brief, with said brief due by March 9, 2018. All other dates in the Court's Scheduling Order, (ECF No. 5), shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/13/2018. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Lutrell
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?