Ramone, et al v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: |
Raymond Vincent Ramone and Rita Yvonne Ramone |
Defendant: |
United States Postal Service and Andres Recinos |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00825 |
Filed: |
June 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Fresno |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer L. Thurston |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1391 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 1, 2019 |
Filing
42
ORDER After Notice of Acceptance of Rule 68 Offer signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/01/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
|
July 16, 2019 |
Filing
38
PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/16/2019. (Hall, S)
|
July 15, 2019 |
Filing
37
ORDER GRANTING 26 the Government's Motion to Limit Damages, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/15/2019. (Hall, S)
|
July 8, 2019 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION and ORDER 31 to Advance Hearing on Motion to Limit Damages (Doc. 26 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/8/2019. Motion hearing ADVANCED to 7/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
February 22, 2018 |
Filing
18
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE and Vacating Settlement Conference, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/22/18. New Case Number: 1:17-cv-00825-JLT. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 31, 2018 |
Filing
15
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/31/2018. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 5/1/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 2/9/2018; Non-Expert 7/16/2018; Expert 12/21/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/11/2019; Hearing by 2/8/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Fil ed by 3/1/2019; Hearing by 4/2/2019. Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Bench Trial set for 8/6/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER DISCHARGING 5 the Order to Show Cause Dated September 22, 2017; ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for December 12, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 12/12/2017 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
September 22, 2017 |
Filing
5
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and VACATING the Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?