Cavanaugh v. Youngblood et al
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Cavanaugh
Defendant: Donny Youngblood, Brian Hull, Arminda Zabala, Josh Jennings, Oscar Fuentez, David K. Fennell, M.D., Stirling Price, David Landrum, Christopher Guzman and Dillion Morgan
Case Number: 1:2017cv00832
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Closing the Action pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/17/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING 95 Request to Extend the Deadline by Which to File the Dismissal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/2019. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DISCHARGING 78 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Patrick J. Cavanaugh, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2019. (Hall, S)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING Counsel's Request 88 for the Court to Order the Warden to Allow Telephone Contact as Lacking Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/14/2019. (Hall, S)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Patrick J. Cavanaugh, CDCR #BH-5039 on 08/19/19 at 9:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 76 Plaintiff's Motion to be Transported to the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/2019. (Hall, S)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER 74 to Modify the Meet and Confer Schedule with Regard to Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2019. (Hall, S)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Update the Docket and Terminate Christopher Guzman and Dillon Morgan as Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/7/2019. (Hall, S)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 64 Motion to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/2019. (Hall, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Closing the Case as to Defendants Fennell and Landrum, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/2018. (Hall, S)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF to File a Stipulated Request for Dismissal or a Formal Motion to Dismiss Related to Defendants Fennell and Landrum, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/2/2018. (Hall, S)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2018. (Hall, S)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Stipulation to Extend the Pleading Amendment Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline extended to 9/14/2018. (Hall, S)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/4/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 7/30/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/17/2018; Non-Expert 2/5/2019; Expert 4/9/2019. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/23/2019; Hearing by 5/21/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/4/2019; Hearing by 7/16/201 9. Settlement Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER adopting 38 Findings and Recommendations granting 28 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/2/2018. Amended Complaint due by 5/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant the Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/12/2018. Referred to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 Defendant Western States International Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for a Second Extension of Time to File the Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/2017. (Hall, S)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to File the Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/10/2017. (Hall, S)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order directing the Clerk to update the docket and terminate Arminda Zabala as a defendant in the action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/16/2017. (Rosales, O)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and DIRECTING the Clerk to Issue New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/23/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavanaugh v. Youngblood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Ken I. Karan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arminda Zabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Fuentez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Fennell, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stirling Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillion Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?