Quiroga v. Youngblood et al
Plaintiff: Monico J. Quiroga, III
Defendant: Donny Youngblood and Kern County Sheriff's Entity
Case Number: 1:2017cv00859
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss as Frivolous and for Failure to Obey a Court Order; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Adopting 12 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Plaintiff's Request 2 Proceed IFP, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/28/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/14/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within 21-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/10/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroga v. Youngblood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monico J. Quiroga, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?