Long v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Long
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc., R. Malone and H. Mehloff
Case Number: 1:2017cv00898
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 37 Request for Extension of Time to Identify Jane Doe; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the 9 Case signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/19/2021. Referred to Judge Unassigned; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the Case Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/13/2021 Show Cause Response due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Identify Jane Doe signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/08/2021. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISCHARGING 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ; ORDER GRANTING 30 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for a Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/17/2021. ( Case Management Deadline: 20-Day Deadline) (Copy of this order mailed to : Matthew M. Grigg as ordered and Subpoena, Amended Complaint 9 , USM 285 Form and (2) copies of this order forwarded to USM-FRS)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CONTEMPT SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA FOURTEEN-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/26/2021. (Show Cause Response due within 14-Day Deadline)(Copies of this order, Doc. 25, and Doc. 27 mailed to Matthew M. Grigg as Ordered)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/14/2020. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Rivera, O)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Amend Subpoena; and Order Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Amended Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/15/2020. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING 18 Findings and Recommendations; and ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion for Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/20/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss this Action without Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/12/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/1/2019. (Flores, E)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/8/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff 90 Days to Identify Jane Doe, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2019. (Hellings, J)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONSto allow this case to proceed only against Jane Doe on an eighth amendment claim, all other claims and defendants are dismissed; Case referred back to Magistrate Judge, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/11/18. H. Mehloff, Corizon Health, Inc. and R. Malone terminated (Martin-Gill, S)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Assign District Judge; and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Allow This Case to Proceed Only Against Jane Doe on an Eighth Amendment Claim re 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/18. This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The New Case No. is: 1:17-cv-0898-LJO-JLT. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Mehloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?