United States of America v. 29.81 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Kern County, California et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 29.81 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Kern County, California, Malek & Schipper Investment and Development Corp., Gerald J. Wenstrand and Kern County Treasurer-Tax Collector
Case Number: 1:2017cv00932
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/23/2018. (Jessen, A)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AFTER 45 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 11/15/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings, including the Settlement Conference set for 10/29/2018, are VACATED. (Hall, S)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 42 Motion for Relief from Requirement that an Individual with Full Settlement Authority Attend the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2018. (Hall, S)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELECONFERENCE re: Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2018. (Hall, S)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion re Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2018. Expert disclosure due by 7/25/2018; rebuttal due by 8/15/2018; expert discovery completed by 10/2/2018. No other modifications to the case schedule are authorized. (Hall, S)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED DECISION and ORDER authorizing withdrawal of Depositsigned by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 2/1/2018; Non-Expert 9/24/2018; Expert 9/24/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield , 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/3/2018; Hearing by 10/31/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/7/2018; Hearing by 12/19/2018. Settlement Conference set for 10 /12/2018 at 01:00 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Delivery of Possession signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion and Directing the Clerk of the Court to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/19/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 29.81 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Kern County, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Anthony Gentner(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 29.81 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Kern County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malek & Schipper Investment and Development Corp.
Represented By: Christopher D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald J. Wenstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Treasurer-Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?