Jacquot et al v. Sunset Square et al
Plaintiff: Dierdre Jacquot and Robert Jacquot
Defendant: Sunset Square and Man-Arneet Corporation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00945
Filed: July 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/04/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; VACATING DATES AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS. Based upon the settlement of this action, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending matters and dates in this action are VACATED; andDispositional documents shall be filed within seven (7) days from the date of service of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default be Granted 11 . Matter referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/23/2017. (Timken, A)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Clerk to Terminate Sunset Square signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/19/2017. Sunset Square (a General Partnership) terminated.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacquot et al v. Sunset Square et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dierdre Jacquot
Represented By: Layne Eric Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jacquot
Represented By: Layne Eric Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Square
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man-Arneet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?