Anglin v. Barron et al
Plaintiff: Debra Anglin
Defendant: Ethele Barron, Jim A. Barron, Jose A. Gonzales and EB Preferred
Case Number: 1:2017cv00974
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING Debtor Examination 47 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/12/2019. (Hall, S)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING DEBTOR EXAMINATION 45 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/12/2018. Judgment Debtor Examination of Ethele Barron continued to 3/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION RE: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT 39 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2018. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 12/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION TO ENFORCEMENT JUDGMENT re 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/15/2018. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 6/4/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING the Hearing Date of December 1, 2017; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Update the Docket and TERMINATE Jose Gonzales as a Defendant in the Action re 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2017. (Hall, S)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 14 Request to Stay the Matter, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/15/2017. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anglin v. Barron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Anglin
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Russell Handy
Represented By: Mary Irene Melton
Represented By: Dennis J. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethele Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim A. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Preferred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?