Pack v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terah Diane Pack
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01004
Filed: July 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing entry of Judgment in favor of Commissioner of Social Security and against Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2018. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Doc. 14 ), Defendant shall file her Opposition no later than May 25, 2018. Any Reply shall be filed within fifteen (15) days of the filing of the Opposition. (Valdez, E)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/31/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pack v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terah Diane Pack
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?