National Continental Insurance Company v. Young's Cargo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Continental Insurance Company
Defendant: Young's Cargo, Inc., Brian Vermilya and Kulwant Singh
Case Number: 1:2017cv01016
Filed: July 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER on Stipulated Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/26/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Brian Vermilya Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/15/2020. (Jessen, A)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the pretrial conference. Pretrial Conference currently set for 3/30/2020 is continued and will now be held on 10/1/2020 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The trial date is vacated and will not be reset at this time. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/10/2020. (Rooney, M)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order GRANTING stipulation to continue non-expert discovery deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/2019. (Non Expert Discovery due by 10/18/2019) (Rosales, O.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order re stipulated modification of scheduling order deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/19/2019. (Non Expert Discovery due by 9/14/2019; Dispositive Motions filed by 10/29/2019; Expert Disclosure due by 12/15/2019; Rebut tal Expert Disclosure due by 1/15/2020; Expert Discovery due by 2/15/2020; Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Bench Trial (3-5 days) set for 5/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill) (Rosales, O.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order re stipulation to continue discovery deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/6/2019. (Non Expert Discovery due by 6/14/2019) (Rosales, O.)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Granting Defendants' 15 16 Motions to Set Aside Default and Denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Default Judgment as Moot; ORDER Directing Defendants Young's Cargo, Inc. and Kulwant Singh dba Youngs Freightway to File an Answer to the Complaint signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/21/2018. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Findings and Recommendations recommending that Defendants' 15 16 Motions to set Aside Default be granted and that Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Default Judgment be denied as moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/30/2018. Motions are referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 5/14/2018. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Continental Insurance Company v. Young's Cargo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Hee Young Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young's Cargo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Vermilya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kulwant Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?