Robertson v. Garcia et al.
Plaintiff: Wayne Jerome Robertson
Defendant: D. Garcia and B. Jones
Case Number: 1:2017cv01022
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/15/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendants' Amended Application to stay Discovery and continue Deadlines 40 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/21/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Second Informational ORDER-Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion 36 ; ORDER GRANTING Leave for Plaintiff to File Supplemental Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment In Compliance with FRCP 56 and Local Rule 260(b),signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/19. (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that inmate Wayne Jerome Robertson is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS COPRUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Wayne Jerome Robertson, CDCR# C-24851, for a Settlement Conference on October 1, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 90 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2018. Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER acknowledging receipt of filing fee re 10 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/6/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 7 Motion to Proceed IFP and directing Plaintiff to submit filing fee signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/4/2017. (Filing Fee of $400.00 due within 21-Days).(Lundstrom, T)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/15/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 10/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Garcia et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jerome Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?