Daily v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Yvette M. Daily
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01041
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(G) and Entry of Judgment, re 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 29, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants responsive pleading shall be filed on or before June 29, 2018; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before July 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/29/2018. (Hernandez, M)
April 11, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daily v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette M. Daily
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?