Smith v State of California [CA Dept. of Corrections and Rehabilitation]

Plaintiff: Earlene Smith
Defendant: State of California [California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation]
Case Number: 1:2017cv01058
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 Findings and Recommendations That Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss be Granted, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/11/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 11, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. 24).Within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/2018. (Hernandez, M)
May 10, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MAY 23, 2018 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing set for May 23, 2018, is VACATED and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/10/2018. (Hernandez, M)
December 26, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 16 Order to Show Cause and EXTENDING Time for Service of Complaint; Ninety Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/26/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 12, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 4(m). Accordingly, Plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to show cause in writing within ten (10) days from the date of service of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to serve the complaint in compliance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 29, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 14 Findings and Recommendations and Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 7 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/29/17. Amended Complaint Due Within Ten Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 8, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING GRANTING DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS. OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN 14 DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/8/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 24, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 7 RECOMMENDING GRANTING DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The matter is referred to U.S. District Judge O'Neill; OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN 14 DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/23/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 20, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING November 1, 2017 Hearing on Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v State of California [CA Dept. of Corrections and Rehabilitation]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlene Smith
Represented By: Che Lewellyn Hashim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California [California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation]
Represented By: Tamara Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?