Cuadra v. George Brown Sports Club-Palm, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mario Cuadra
Defendant: George Brown Sports Club-Palm, Inc., George Brown Sports Club, Inc. and Johnston Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01063
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Third Party Defendants, William McKeand and WCM, INC., dba Tec-Spec Constructors, an extension of time to December 11, 2017, to respond to the Third Party Complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2017. (Rooney, M)
November 13, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/16/2017 and CONTINUING it to 3/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/13/2017. (Rooney, M)
November 6, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re-setting the Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/6/2017. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuadra v. George Brown Sports Club-Palm, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Cuadra
Represented By: Steven Sciacqua Dias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Brown Sports Club-Palm, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony N. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Brown Sports Club, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony N. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?