Lewis v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabiliation et al

Plaintiff: Tony R. Lewis
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabiliation, Kim Hollands, O. Delgado, J. Ramirez, D. Calvillo, B. Nickell, M. Madden, I. Dressel, M. Santa Maria, C. Sian and T. Webber
Case Number: 1:2017cv01064
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants; All claims and defendants are dismissed, except for plaintiffs claims for excessive use of force in violation of the Eighth Amendment brought against defe ndants B. Nickell, J. Ramirez and O. Delgado, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/21/18. ***I. Dressel (Correctional Sergeant at CCI), Kim Hollands (Warden at CCI), M. Madden (Lieutenant at CCI), M. Santa Maria (Correctional Officer at CCI), C. Sian (Registered Nurse at CCI), T. Webber (Correctional Officer at CCI), California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and D. Calvillo (Lieutenant at CCI) Terminated*** (Martin-Gill, S)
March 23, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That All Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, Except for Plaintiff's Claims for Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment Against Defendants B. Nickell, J. Ramirez and O. Delgado, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/22/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER filed 8/17/2017 granting 5 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabiliation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony R. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabiliation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hollands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Calvillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Nickell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Dressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Santa Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Sian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?