Reyes v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Leon Reyes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01065
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING Action to Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 18, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause (ECF Nos. 13 , 15 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/2018. It is hereby ordered that the order to show cause filed April 9, 2018 is DISCHARGED. (Valdez, E)
April 9, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a written response to this order to show cause why this action should not be d ismissed for failure to prosecute within seven (7) days of the date of service of this order. Failure to comply with this order to show cause shall result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/9/2018. (Hernandez, M)
August 14, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/17. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Reyes
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel Adam Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?