May 1, 2024 |
Filing
195
**CORRECTED**ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Parameters and Scheduling Pre-Conference Telephonic Discussion signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 5/1/2024. Settlement Statements Due: June 14, 2024. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference: June 21,2024, Plaintiffs: 10:00 AM and Defendants: 11:00 AM; Settlement Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Navarro, F)
|
February 16, 2024 |
Filing
183
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 177 Motion to Substitute Successors in Interest in Place of Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 02/16/2024. (Flores, E)
|
April 27, 2023 |
Filing
168
ORDER ON ATTORNEY FEE AWARD, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/27/2023. (Apodaca, P)
|
March 31, 2023 |
Filing
163
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE FILING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY REGARDING ATTORNEY FEE AWARD (DOC. NO. 158 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/30/2023. (Apodaca, P)
|
March 2, 2023 |
Filing
158
ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/2/2023. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 16, 2022 |
Filing
140
ORDER DENYING 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Reassignment and 115 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/15/2022. Joint statement due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
|
December 22, 2021 |
Filing
111
ORDER ADOPTING IN PART and DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART 100 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Spoliation Sanctions, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/21/2021. Filing Deadline Due Within Thirty-Days. (Maldonado, C)
|
October 20, 2020 |
Filing
102
ORDER GRANTING 101 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Enlargement of Time to File Written Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/2020. Objections to F&R due by 11/12/2020. (Hall, S)
|
October 8, 2020 |
Filing
100
ORDER WITHDRAWING 98 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Spoliation; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Motion for Sanctions Due to Spoliation 86 ; ORDER DENYING 99 Ex Parte Application as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/8/2020. Referred to District Judge. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
September 28, 2020 |
Filing
98
ORDER DENYING 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Spoliation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/28/2020. (Hall, S)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing
89
ORDER RE: JOINT TRIAL SCHEDULING REPORT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 5, 2019. (ECF No. 88)(Munoz, I)
|
October 22, 2019 |
Filing
87
ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT KERN COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 22, 2019. (ECF No. 85)(Munoz, I)
|
September 6, 2019 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Defendants' 67 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/6/19. (Gonzalez, R)
|
June 25, 2019 |
Filing
64
STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismissal of Certain Claims Against the County of Kern based upon Alleged Policies, Practices, and Customs of the Kern County Sheriff's Office Acts and/or Acts and Omissions of Kern County Sheriff Employees signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 5, 2019 |
Filing
59
ORDER Closing the Action as to Defendant Donny Youngblood and DIRECTING THE CLERK to Update the Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2019. (Hall, S)
|
March 13, 2019 |
Filing
54
ORDER Closing the Action as to Defendants Swanson, Miller and Allen 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/13/2019. (Hall, S)
|
March 6, 2019 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION and ORDER 51 re: "First Look" Agreement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2019. (Hall, S)
|
December 21, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER DENYING IN PART STIPULATION TO AMEND THE CASE SCHEDULE, 44 . The stipulation is DENIED except that all non-expert discovery SHALL be completed no later than May 24, 2019. In the event counsel cannot develop a workable deposition schedule, they SHALL contact the Court for an informal conference at which the Court can assist them in setting it. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/21/2018. (Timken, A)
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing
43
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/2018. (Hall, S)
|
June 7, 2018 |
Filing
39
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/7/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 6/11/2018; Non-Expert 2/18/2019; Expert 5/24/2019. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set f or 9/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/10/2019; Hearing by 7/15/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/2/2019; Hearing by 8/13/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER GRANTING 35 Stipulation Allowing County Defendants to File First Amended Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/1/2018. Amended answer due within three court days. (Hall, S)
|
April 10, 2018 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/10/18. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
14
ORDER APPROVING 13 the Stipulation of the Parties for the Filing of a First Amended Complaint and VACATING the Hearing Date of January 10, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2017. Amended Complaint due by 12/20/2017. Motion to Dismiss 11 TERMINATED. Hearing date of 1/10/2018 VACATED. (Hall, S)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
10
STIPULATION and ORDER 9 to Extend Time for County of Kern Defendants to File Answer to Complaint and to Extend Time for Service on Individual County Employees, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/13/2017. Defendants' response due by 12/1/2017. (Hall, S)
|