Golden Gate Salmon Association, et al. v. Ross, et al.
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Salmon Association, Bay.org, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. and Defenders of Wildlife
Defendant: Wilbur Ross, Chris Oliver and National Marine Fisheries Service
Intervenor_defendant: State Water Contractors, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California and Department of Water Resources
Case Number: 1:2017cv01172
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re: Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/13/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING OTHER DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2019. (Munoz, I)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/2019 RELATING 2:19-cv-0547 JAM AC to 1:05-cv-1207 LJO EPG, 1:17-cv-1172 LJO EPG and 1:17-cv-1176 LJO EPG. 2:19-cv-0547 JAM AC is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation to modify the scheduling order, document 71 , as follows: Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment filing deadline is 10/12/2018; defendants' opposition/cross-motion(s) for summary judgment dea dline is 11/13/2018; plaintiffs' reply in support of summary judgment motion and opposition to cross-motion(s) for summary judgment deadline is 12/11/2018; and defendants' reply in support of their cross-motion(s) for summary judgment deadline is 1/15/2019. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/27/2018. (Rooney, M)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RESOLVING REMAINING ISSUE RE MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 13, 2018. (Munoz, I)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order GRANTING stipulation to extend deadlines and modify scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2018. (Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment by 9/28/2018; Defendants shall file their op position and any cross-motion for summary judgment by 10/30/2018; Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of summary judgment and opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment by 11/20/2018; Defendants shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment by 12/18/2018) (Rosales, O)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 22, 2018. (ECF NO. 42) (Munoz, I)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2018. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Munoz, I)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER setting the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment: July 27, 2018; Defendants' Oppositions/Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: August 29, 2018; Plaintiffs' Reply/Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: September 19, 2018; and Defendants' Reply to Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: October 10, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/20/2017. (Rooney, M)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING With Conditions 7 State Water Contractors' and Metropolitan Water District of Southern California's and 28 California Department of Water Resources' Motions to Intervene signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference for 10/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTIONS TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, FRESNO DIVISION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/30/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/31/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Gate Salmon Association, et al. v. Ross, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oliver
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Salmon Association
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay.org
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: State Water Contractors
Represented By: William M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Metropolitan Water District of Southern California
Represented By: William M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Department of Water Resources
Represented By: Melinda Pilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?