Bay.org et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Bay.org, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. and Defenders of Wildlife
Defendant: Ryan Zinke, Greg Sheehan and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Intervenor_defendant: State Water Contractors, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California and Department of Water Resources
Case Number: 1:2017cv01176
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re 107 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/13/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE REQUEST TO STAY CASE FOR 30 DAYS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 3, 2019. (ECF NO. 105) (Munoz, I)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING OTHER DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2019. (Munoz, I)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/2019 RELATING 2:19-cv-0547 JAM AC to 1:05-cv-1207 LJO EPG, 1:17-cv-1172 LJO EPG and 1:17-cv-1176 LJO EPG. 2:19-cv-0547 JAM AC is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE REQUEST TO STAY CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 11, 2019. (ECF NO. 88) (Munoz, I)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR BRIEFING OF DEPARTMENT OF WATER RESOURCES' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 4, 2019. (Munoz, I)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 30, 2019. (ECF No. 85)(Munoz, I)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER STAYING CASE DURING LAPSE IN APPROPRIATIONS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 18, 2019. (ECF NO. 83) (Munoz, I)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation to modify the scheduling order as follows: Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment filing deadline is 1/15/2019; defendants' opposition/cross-motion(s) for summary judgment deadline is 2/19/201 9; plaintiffs' reply in support of summary judgment motion and opposition to cross-motion(s) for summary judgment deadline is 3/12/2019; and defendants' reply in support of their cross-motion(s) for summary judgment deadline is 4/2/2019. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/27/2018. (Rooney, M)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND GRANTING MOTION TO CONSIDER EXTRA-RECORD EVIDENCE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 16, 2018. (ECF NO. 53) (Munoz, I)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order GRANTING stipulation to extend deadlines and modify scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2018. ( Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment by 12/18/2018; Defendants shall file their opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment by 1/22/2019; Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of summary judgment and opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment by 2/12/2019; Defendants shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment by 3/5/2019) (Rosales, O)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 28, 2018. (Munoz, I)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER setting the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment: October 10, 2018; Defendants' Oppositions/Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: November 9, 2018; Plaintiffs' Reply/Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: November 30, 2018; and Defendants' Reply to Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: December 21, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/20/2017. (Rooney, M)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting with conditions Motions to Intervene 16 , 34 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order setting mandatory scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/2017. (Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) A Joint Scheduling Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in CM/ECF, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference and shall be emailed in Word format to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Rosales, O)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTIONS TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, FRESNO DIVISION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/30/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/31/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay.org et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sheehan
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay.org
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Represented By: Claire Helen Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: State Water Contractors
Represented By: William M. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Metropolitan Water District of Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Department of Water Resources
Represented By: Melinda Pilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?