Whitehead v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Whitehead
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2017cv01204
Filed: September 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CLOSING CASE re 24 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order after 23 Notice of Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2018. (Stipulation to Dismiss filed by 3/23/2018) (Rosales, O)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to DEFENDANT to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Its Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/12/2018. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2018. (Hall, S)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to File Administrative Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/5/2018. Administrative Record due by 2/5/2018; motion to supplement due by 2/19/2018. (Hall, S)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/11/2017. Initial Disclosures 12/18/2017. Administrative Record Deadlines: Filing 1/8/2018; Objections/Motions to Supplement 1/24/2018. Discovery Cut-Off 4/2/2018. Briefing Deadlines: Opening Briefs 4/16/2018; Oppositions 5/14/2018; Reply Briefs 6/4/2018; Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Mediation Deadline 3/30/2018. (Hall, S)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order APPROVING the stipulation for an extension of time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2017. (Response to the complaint due by 11/6/2017) (Rosales, O)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/16/2017 closing the case as to Defendant, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan only re 10 . (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Whitehead
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Represented By: Glenn Robert Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?