Schreane v. Matevousian

Petitioner: Clarence D. Schreane
Respondent: Andre Matevousian
Case Number: 1:2017cv01217
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss 7 MOTION for Injunctive Relief, Dismiss 14 MOTION for Redress of Grievance, and Deny Petitioner's 23 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/14/18. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 10, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Supplemental Briefing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/10/18. Briefing Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 13, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to Re-Serve 22 Response to Petition and File Certification of Service signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/12/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 28, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Respondent to File a Response to Petitioner's 7 Motion for Injunctive Relief and 14 Motion Petitioning Court to Redress Grievance, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/28/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schreane v. Matevousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clarence D. Schreane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andre Matevousian
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?