Lapachet v. California Forensic Medical Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Lapachet
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group Inc., Taylor Fithian, Lani Antonio, Veronica Berghorst, Jessamae Trinidad, Grashika Devendra, Tabitha King, Amardeep Tawana, Judith Alejandre, County of Alpine and Adam Christianson
Case Number: 1:2017cv01226
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 7/31/2018 to file a response to the first amended complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 4, 2018 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 51 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/01/2018. (Flores, E)
December 26, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapachet v. California Forensic Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lapachet
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Sanjay Stephen Schmidt
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Maya Melissa Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group Inc.
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lani Antonio
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Berghorst
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessamae Trinidad
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grashika Devendra
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha King
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amardeep Tawana
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Alejandre
Represented By: Peter George Bertling
Represented By: Jemma Allison Parker Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alpine
Represented By: Shanan L. Hewitt
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Represented By: Jonathan B. Paul
Represented By: Jesse M. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Represented By: Shanan L. Hewitt
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Represented By: Jonathan B. Paul
Represented By: Jesse M. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?