Frank Wells v. Gonzales
Plaintiff: Frank Wells
Defendant: Rosa Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2017cv01240
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to File a Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/26/2019. (Case Management Deadline: 10/18/2019, Filing Deadline: 11/1/2019) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 46 Motion to Compel Response to Admissions and 47 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; ORDER Re: Official Information Privilege, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/2019. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER following telephonic Discovery and Status Conference; ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy of Lodged First Amended Complaint 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Lodged First Amended Complaint) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/4/19. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to Amend Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/2/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's First Lodged Amended Complaint 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/15/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/12/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/2018: This case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this 1 Action Proceed Against Defendant Rosa Gonzalez on Plaintff's Claims for Violation of Plaintiff's First Amendment Right signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/06/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 4/30/2018.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Wells v. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?