Williams v. Rego et al
Plaintiff: Michael B. Williams
Defendant: Brenna Rego and Kenneth Underwood
Case Number: 1:2017cv01273
Filed: September 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Case be Dismissed, without Prejudice, for Failure to Comply with Court Order re 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/17/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Plaintiff to Notify the Court Whether He Wishes to Voluntarily Dismiss this Case without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/31/18. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE Plaintiff's 7 Notice Regarding Mail; ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of Docket Sheet signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Rego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenna Rego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?