U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Prestige Care, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Prestige Care, Inc., Prestige Senior Living, LLC, Cypress Point Ventures, LLC, Prestige Senior Management, LLC, Care Center (Anchorage), Inc., Green Valley Ventures, LLC, Lake Havasu Too, LLC, Sierra Vista Ventures, LLC, Chico Ventures, LLC, Manteca Ventures, LLC, Marysville Ventures, LLC, Oroville Assisted Living, LLC, Visalia Ventures, LLC, Care Center (Lewiston), Inc., Caldwell Ventures, LLC, Parkwood Meadows, LLC, Kalispell Ventures, LLC, Henderson Ventures II, LLC, Care Center (Glisan), Inc., Care Center (Hood River), Inc., Care Center (Laneco), Inc., Care Center (Linda Vista), Inc., Care Center (Menlo Park), Inc., Care Center (Porthaven), Inc., Care Center (Willowbrook), Inc., PCI Care Venture I, Inc., Summerplace Assisted Living, LLC, Care Center (Camas), Inc., Care Center (Centralia), Inc., Care Center (Colville), Inc., Care Center (Edmonds), Inc., Care Center (Hazel Dell), Inc., Care Center (Sullivan Park), Inc., Care Center (Sunnyside), Inc., Care Center (Toppenish), Inc., Gig Harbor Ventures, LLC, Living Court Ventures, LLC, Enumclaw Ventures II, LLC and Does 1-100, Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2017cv01299
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE Stipulation to STAY Action Pending Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/21/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re Joint Stipulation to Lift Shutdown Stay and to Vacate Deadlines in Scheduling Order and Stay Action Pending Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/19. Case stayed. Settlement Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Settlement Disclosures, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/27/2018. Following review, the Court HEREBY ADOPTS the Stipulated Protective Order for Settlement Disclosures submitted by the parties. (Valdez, E)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY AND EXTENSION. Due to a lapse in appropriations for the EEOC at midnight on December 21, 2018, the litigation of this matter shall be STAYED until the EEOC's funding is restored and all pendin g deadlines in this matter will be extended for the same number of days as the EEOC's lapse in funding. Additionally, upon adequate funding, the EEOC will move the Court to lift the stay as soon as possible. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/26/2018. (Timken, A)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER CONTINUING STAY IN THIS ACTION TO FEBRUARY 4, 2019. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2018. (Timken, A)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for October 25, 2018 at 9:30 am before Judge McAuliffe), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/28/2018. PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. (Valdez, E)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Amended joint stipulation to schedule settlement conference, to continue pleading deadlines, mandatory scheduling conference and related dates, and to stay discovery and pending motions; Order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/27/2018. (Settlement Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Rosales, O)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, ' signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/17/2018. (Kusamura, W)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO CONTINUE Scheduling Conference from 5/31/2018 to 9/7/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on Request to Seal Documents signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/8/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A STAY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for a stay of this action is DENIED as moot, and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within fourteen days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/23/2018. (Hernandez, M)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 2/6/2018 to 5/31/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to the complaint on or before January 23, 2018. Any motion filed in response to the EEOCs complaint shall be set in accord with Local Rule 230. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/4/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to continue the Scheduling Conference to 2/6/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Prestige Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Nechole Garcia
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Point Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Senior Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Anchorage), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Valley Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Havasu Too, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Vista Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chico Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manteca Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marysville Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oroville Assisted Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visalia Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Lewiston), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkwood Meadows, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalispell Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Ventures II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Glisan), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Hood River), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Laneco), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Linda Vista), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Menlo Park), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Porthaven), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Willowbrook), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCI Care Venture I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerplace Assisted Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Camas), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Centralia), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Colville), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Edmonds), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Hazel Dell), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Sullivan Park), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Sunnyside), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center (Toppenish), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gig Harbor Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Court Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enumclaw Ventures II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?