Jones v. Oliveira, et al.
Plaintiff: Charles B. Jones
Defendant: M. Oliveira, J Garcia, Ortega, J. Pasion, K. Matta and D Overley
Case Number: 1:2017cv01311
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants' Motion to modify Discovery and Scheduling Order 40 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/31/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/7/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; Sixty (60) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/30/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR Project and Staying the Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/7/2019. (Jessen, A)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for Plaintiff to Provide additional Information to Identify Defendant John Doe #3 for USM Service of Process, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/25/2019.(Case Management Deadline: 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to proceed 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/30/2018. (First Amended Complaint due within 21-Days). (Lundstrom, T)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order; Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/25/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full and denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Injunctive Relief for lack of jurisdiction signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Clerk to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief be DENIED for Lack of Jurisdiction re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill. This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is 1:17-cv-01311-LJO-SKO (PC). Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Oliveira, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Oliveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pasion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Overley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?