Deloney v. County of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Wilma Deloney
Defendant: County of Fresno, Corizon Health, Inc., "fnu" Vinson, "fnu" McCoy, "fnu" Ramos, Reuben Canal, "fnu" Yusif, Genevive Garcia, Mai Yang, Donald Kirkorian, Jasmine Santos, Debbie Trow and Marty Whitecotton
Case Number: 1:2017cv01336
Filed: October 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE: Stipulated Request for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/03/2020. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE: Stipulated Request for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Garcia, Krikorian, Santos, Trow, Whitecotton, and Vang aka Yang signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/24/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting Settlement Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/4/2019. (Rooney, M)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2019. (ECF Nos. 46, 50, 52, 70) (Munoz, I)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER modifying Scheduling Order 24 , 62 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/8/2019. Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/26/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/22/2019. Status Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING a continuance of the Mid-Discovery Status Conference currently noticed for 11/19/2018 and CONTINUING it to 12/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. To participate telephonically, each party is directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/14/2018. (Rooney, M)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Defendant Corizon Health Inc.'s 29 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/11/18. Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendant Roy Vinton on the Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/08/2018. (Flores, E)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/23/2018. (Rooney, M)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Defendant Corizon health Inc.'s 9 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/5/18. Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REJECTING stipulated protective order, document 14 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/2/2018. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deloney v. County of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Deloney
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: James A. Cook
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "fnu" Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "fnu" McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "fnu" Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reuben Canal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "fnu" Yusif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevive Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Kirkorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Trow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Whitecotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?