Engelbrecht v. Ripa
Plaintiff: Tonya D. Engelbrecht
Defendant: Kelly Ripa
Case Number: 1:2017cv01339
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE and ORDER FINDING that Appeal was NOT Taken in Good Faith signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending as follows: 1) This action be dismissed without prejudice, based on Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this case and failure to comply with the Court's order dated August 21, 2018, (ECF No. 11 ); an d 2) The Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. These recommendations are referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, with objections due within fourteen days after service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/9/2018. (Rooney, M)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/13/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/17/2018. (Flores, E)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed only on her claim for breach of contract against Defendant and that all other claims be dismissed with prejudice. The Court does not recommend granting further leave to a mend because Plaintiff filed her First Amended Complaint after receiving ample legal guidance from the Court, and it appears that the deficiencies of the First Amended Complaint cannot be cured by further leave to amend. These findings and recommenda tions are submitted to the district judge assigned to the case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Within twenty-one (21) days after being served with these findings and recommendations, Plaintiff may file written objections with the Court. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations." Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/16/208. (Rooney, M)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff as follows: 1) Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies identified by the Court in this order if she believes additional true factual allegations would state a claim, within thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order; 2) If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall caption the amended complaint First Amended Complaint and refer to the case number 1:17-cv-01339-LJO-EPG; 3) Alternatively, within thirty (30) d ays from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff may notify the Court that she wishes to stand on her original complaint, subject to this Court issuing findings and recommendations to the assigned district court judge recommending that the case be dismissed for failure to state a claim; and 4) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or notify the Court that she wishes to stand on this complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order, the Court will issue find ings and recommendations to the assigned district court judge recommending that Plaintiff's case be dismissed for failure to state a claim and failure to comply with a Court order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/30/2018. (Rooney, M)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/4/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/16/2017. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engelbrecht v. Ripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya D. Engelbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Ripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?