Northern Central Distributing, Inc. v. Bogenschutz et al
Plaintiff: Northern Central Distributing, Inc.
Defendant: Rockie Bogenschutz and Rockie's Containers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01351
Filed: October 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE: Joint Request for Dismissal of Entire Action signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/29/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CONSENT DECREE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/9/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SECOND CONTEMPT ORDER 63 Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/01/2019. It is herby ordered that Plaintiffs Second Contempt Motion (Doc. No. 63) is DENIED; Defendants shall FILE by March 11, 2019, evidence proving, if possible, that Defendants are not currently using the fourteen protected SKUs in violation of the Stipulated Injunction, and Plaintiff may file by March 18, 2019, a response to Defendants filing. (Gonzales, V)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the Non-Expert Discovery deadline to 7/19/2019. The Court further continues the Mid-Discovery Status Conference currently set for 3/13/2019, continuing it to 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/31/2019. (Rooney, M)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING IN PARTY AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, 53 . Plaintiff is awarded $12,866.24 in fees and $225.18 in costs, which are to be paid jointly and severally by Defendants to Plaintiff within sixty days of this order. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/12/2018. (Timken, A)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER directing that the parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 9/14/2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/4/2018. (Rooney, M)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause re Contempt, 27 . Defendants are held in civil contempt of Court for violating the Stipulated Injunction. Pursuant to the Stipulated Injun ction and this Court's authority to impose remedial sanctions for civil contempt, Defendants are sanctioned jointly and severally $500 per violation for the sixty-seven violations to the Stipulated Injunction identified above, for a total o f $33,500.00, to be paid to Plaintiff within thirty days of this order. Plaintiff shall file by September 4, 2018, a memorandum of fees and costs with supporting affidavits concerning Plaintiff's enforcement of the Stipulated Injunction, and Defendants may file by September 18, 2018, an opposition to Plaintiff's memorandum of fees and costs. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/21/2018. (Timken, A)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER granting the parties' request for an extension of the initial disclosures deadline to 8/31/2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2018. (Rooney, M)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND ORDER VACATING JULY 23, 2018 HEARING, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/19/2018. (Kusamura, W)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER granting the parties' request for an extension of time to 7/23/2018 for the exchange of initial disclosures. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/13/2018. (Rooney, M)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Show Cause Hearing currently set for 6/11/2018 to 6/25/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/22/2018. (Kusamura, W)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/11/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Sant Agata, S)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/8/2018. (Kusamura, W)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Third Stipulated Request for Continuance of 6 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION : Motion Hearing currently set for 12/18/2017 is moved to 1/8/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/4/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATED Request for Continuance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Motion Hearing currently set for 12/4/2017 is moved to 12/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/15/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING; Motion Hearing currently set for 11/20/2017 is now set for 12/4/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Central Distributing, Inc. v. Bogenschutz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Central Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Hamilton Borchers
Represented By: Marcus Natale DiBuduo
Represented By: Sydney Alice Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockie Bogenschutz
Represented By: Russell K Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockie's Containers, LLC
Represented By: Russell K Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?